Senate | 08/14/2017 | Postponed | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 07/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 07/22/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/22/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/22/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Government Reform, Select | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |