Senate | 08/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
House | 07/27/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Passed | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Statement(s) submitted | ||
Senate | 07/26/2017 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Remarks ordered printed | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amended | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amendment to amendment offered | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Motion fails | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Motion to appeal ruling | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Point of order overruled | ||
Senate | 07/25/2017 | Point of order | ||
Senate | 07/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 07/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |