Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB71 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/18/2017

                            85S10303 MEW-D
 By: Perry S.B. No. 71


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the small-sized district adjustment under the
 Foundation School Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.106(a-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In determining funding for an open-enrollment charter
 school under Subsection (a):
 (1)  [,] adjustments under Sections 42.102, [42.103,]
 42.104, and 42.105 are based on the average adjustment for the
 state; and
 (2)  the adjustment under Section 42.103 is based on
 the average adjustment for the state that would have been provided
 under that section as it existed on January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Effective September 1, 2022, Sections
 42.103(b) and (d), Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The basic allotment of a school district that [contains
 at least 300 square miles and] has not more than 1,600 students in
 average daily attendance is adjusted by applying the formula:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .0004)) X ABA
 (d)  The basic allotment of a school district that offers a
 kindergarten through grade 12 program and has less than 5,000
 students in average daily attendance is adjusted by applying the
 formula, of the following formulas, that results in the greatest
 adjusted allotment:
 (1)  the formula in Subsection (b), if [or (c) for
 which] the district is eligible for that formula; or
 (2)  AA = (1 + ((5,000 - ADA) X .000025)) X ABA.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2022, Section 42.103(c),
 Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Section 42.103(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The basic allotment of a school district that contains
 less than 300 square miles and has not more than 1,600 students in
 average daily attendance is adjusted by applying the following
 formulas [formula]:
 (1)  for the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2017:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .000275 [.00025])) X ABA
 ;
 (2)  for the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2018:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .00030)) X ABA
 ;
 (3)  for the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2019:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .000325)) X ABA
 ;
 (4)  for the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2020:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .00035)) X ABA
 ; and
 (5)  for the fiscal year beginning September 1, 2021:
 AA = (1 + ((1,600 - ADA) X .000375)) X ABA
 SECTION 4.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act:
 (1)  this Act takes effect September 1, 2017, if this
 Act receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution;
 and
 (2)  if this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 effect on that date, this Act takes effect on the 91st day after the
 last day of the legislative session.