Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB8 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Creighton, et al. S.B. No. 8
2+ (In the Senate - Filed July 18, 2017; July 20, 2017, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ July 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
5+ Nays 2; July 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to health plan and health benefit plan coverage for
712 elective abortion.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended by adding
1015 Subtitle M to read as follows:
1116 SUBTITLE M. FEDERAL PATIENT PROTECTION AND AFFORDABLE CARE ACT
1217 CHAPTER 1695. LEGISLATIVE CONSIDERATIONS
1318 Sec. 1695.001. CONSTITUTIONALITY OF PATIENT PROTECTION AND
1419 AFFORDABLE CARE ACT. This subtitle does not constitute an
1520 acknowledgment by the legislature of the legitimacy of the Patient
1621 Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) as a
1722 constitutional exercise of the power of the United States Congress.
1823 CHAPTER 1696. COVERAGE FOR ELECTIVE ABORTION; PROHIBITIONS AND
1924 REQUIREMENTS
2025 Sec. 1696.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
2126 (1) "Elective abortion" means an abortion, as defined
2227 by Section 245.002, Health and Safety Code, other than an abortion
2328 performed due to a medical emergency as defined by Section 171.002,
2429 Health and Safety Code.
2530 (2) "Health benefit exchange" means an American Health
2631 Benefit Exchange administered by the federal government or created
2732 under Section 1311(b) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care
2833 Act (42 U.S.C. Section 18031(b)).
2934 (3) "Qualified health plan" has the meaning assigned
3035 by Section 1301(a) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care
3136 Act (42 U.S.C. Section 18021(a)).
3237 Sec. 1696.002. PROHIBITED COVERAGE THROUGH HEALTH BENEFIT
3338 EXCHANGE. (a) A qualified health plan offered through a health
3439 benefit exchange may not provide coverage for elective abortion.
3540 (b) This section does not prevent a person from purchasing
3641 optional or supplemental coverage for elective abortion under a
3742 health benefit plan other than a qualified health plan offered
3843 through a health benefit exchange.
3944 SECTION 2. Subtitle A, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
4045 by adding Chapter 1218 to read as follows:
4146 CHAPTER 1218. COVERAGE FOR ELECTIVE ABORTION; PROHIBITIONS AND
4247 REQUIREMENTS
4348 Sec. 1218.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "elective
4449 abortion" means an abortion, as defined by Section 245.002, Health
4550 and Safety Code, other than an abortion performed due to a medical
4651 emergency as defined by Section 171.002, Health and Safety Code.
4752 Sec. 1218.002. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter
4853 applies only to a health benefit plan that provides benefits for
4954 medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health
5055 condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual, group,
5156 blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement, a
5257 group hospital service contract, or an individual or group evidence
5358 of coverage or similar coverage document that is offered by:
5459 (1) an insurance company;
5560 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
5661 under Chapter 842;
5762 (3) a fraternal benefit society operating under
5863 Chapter 885;
5964 (4) a stipulated premium company operating under
6065 Chapter 884;
6166 (5) an exchange operating under Chapter 942;
6267 (6) a health maintenance organization operating under
6368 Chapter 843;
6469 (7) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
6570 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
6671 (8) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
6772 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
6873 (b) This chapter applies to group health coverage made
6974 available by a school district in accordance with Section 22.004,
7075 Education Code.
7176 (c) Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575,
7277 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this chapter applies to:
7378 (1) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
7479 (2) a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
7580 (3) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
7681 and
7782 (4) basic coverage under Chapter 1601.
7883 (d) Notwithstanding Section 1501.251 or any other law, this
7984 chapter applies to coverage under a small or large employer health
8085 benefit plan subject to Chapter 1501.
8186 (e) Notwithstanding Section 1507.003 or 1507.053 or any
8287 other law, this chapter applies to a standard health benefit plan
8388 provided under Chapter 1507.
8489 Sec. 1218.003. CERTAIN COVERAGE NOT AFFECTED. This chapter
8590 does not apply to health benefit plan coverage provided to an
8691 enrollee for any abortion other than an elective abortion as
8792 defined by Section 1218.001.
8893 Sec. 1218.004. COVERAGE BY HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN. A health
8994 benefit plan may provide coverage for elective abortion only if:
9095 (1) the coverage is provided to an enrollee separately
9196 from other health benefit plan coverage offered by the health
9297 benefit plan issuer;
9398 (2) the enrollee pays the premium for coverage for
9499 elective abortion separately from, and in addition to, the premium
95100 for other health benefit plan coverage, if any; and
96101 (3) the enrollee provides a signature for coverage for
97102 elective abortion, separately and distinct from the signature
98103 required for other health benefit plan coverage, if any, provided
99104 to the enrollee by the health benefit plan issuer.
100105 Sec. 1218.005. CALCULATION OF PREMIUM. (a) A health
101106 benefit plan issuer that provides coverage for elective abortion
102107 shall calculate the premium for the coverage so that the premium
103108 fully covers the estimated cost of elective abortion per enrollee,
104109 determined on an actuarial basis.
105110 (b) In calculating a premium under Subsection (a), the
106111 health benefit plan issuer may not take into account any cost
107112 savings in other health benefit plan coverage offered by the health
108113 benefit plan issuer that is estimated to result from coverage for
109114 elective abortion.
110115 (c) A health benefit plan issuer may not provide a premium
111116 discount to or reduce the premium for an enrollee for other health
112117 benefit plan coverage on the basis that the enrollee has coverage
113118 for elective abortion.
114119 Sec. 1218.006. NOTICE BY ISSUER. A health benefit plan
115120 issuer that provides coverage for elective abortion shall at the
116121 time of enrollment in other health benefit plan coverage provide
117122 each enrollee with a notice that:
118123 (1) coverage for elective abortion is optional and
119124 separate from other health benefit plan coverage offered by the
120125 health benefit plan issuer;
121126 (2) the premium cost for coverage for elective
122127 abortion is a premium paid separately from, and in addition to, the
123128 premium for other health benefit plan coverage offered by the
124129 health benefit plan issuer; and
125130 (3) the enrollee may enroll in a health benefit plan
126131 without obtaining coverage for elective abortion.
127132 SECTION 3. This Act applies only to a qualified health plan
128133 offered through a health benefit exchange or a health benefit plan
129134 that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after April
130135 1, 2018. A qualified health plan offered through a health benefit
131136 exchange or a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for
132137 delivery, or renewed before April 1, 2018, is governed by the law as
133138 it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
134139 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
135140 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect December 1, 2017.
141+ * * * * *