Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1019 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1019
1+By: Muñoz, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1019
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the authority of certain water districts to exercise
612 the power of eminent domain.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. CERTAIN IRRIGATION DISTRICTS. Subtitle D, Title
915 6, Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Chapters
1016 7505, 7506, and 7509 to read as follows:
1117 CHAPTER 7505. HIDALGO COUNTY IRRIGATION DISTRICT NO. 6
1218 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
1319 Sec. 7505.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
1420 means the Hidalgo County Irrigation District No. 6.
1521 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
1622 Sec. 7505.051. EMINENT DOMAIN. (a) The district may
1723 exercise the power of eminent domain as provided by this section
1824 only if the district submits a letter to the comptroller not later
1925 than December 31, 2019, in accordance with the requirements of
2026 Section 2206.101(b), Government Code, other than the requirement
2127 that the letter be submitted by the date specified by that
2228 subsection.
2329 (b) Notwithstanding the expiration of the district's
2430 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain under Section
2531 2206.101(c), Government Code, the district may exercise the power
2632 of eminent domain as provided by law applicable to the district on
2733 or after the 90th day after the date the district submits a letter
2834 in accordance with Subsection (a).
2935 CHAPTER 7506. HIDALGO COUNTY IRRIGATION DISTRICT NO. 16
3036 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
3137 Sec. 7506.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
3238 means the Hidalgo County Irrigation District No. 16.
3339 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
3440 Sec. 7506.051. EMINENT DOMAIN. (a) The district may
3541 exercise the power of eminent domain as provided by this section
3642 only if the district submits a letter to the comptroller not later
3743 than December 31, 2019, in accordance with the requirements of
3844 Section 2206.101(b), Government Code, other than the requirement
3945 that the letter be submitted by the date specified by that
4046 subsection.
4147 (b) Notwithstanding the expiration of the district's
4248 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain under Section
4349 2206.101(c), Government Code, the district may exercise the power
4450 of eminent domain as provided by law applicable to the district on
4551 or after the 90th day after the date the district submits a letter
4652 in accordance with Subsection (a).
4753 CHAPTER 7509. HIDALGO COUNTY IRRIGATION DISTRICT NO. 5
4854 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
4955 Sec. 7509.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
5056 means the Hidalgo County Irrigation District No. 5.
5157 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
5258 Sec. 7509.051. EMINENT DOMAIN. (a) The district may
5359 exercise the power of eminent domain as provided by this section
5460 only if the district submits a letter to the comptroller not later
5561 than December 31, 2019, in accordance with the requirements of
5662 Section 2206.101(b), Government Code, other than the requirement
5763 that the letter be submitted by the date specified by that
5864 subsection.
5965 (b) Notwithstanding the expiration of the district's
6066 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain under Section
6167 2206.101(c), Government Code, the district may exercise the power
6268 of eminent domain as provided by law applicable to the district on
6369 or after the 90th day after the date the district submits a letter
6470 in accordance with Subsection (a).
6571 SECTION 2. HIDALGO COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1.
6672 Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws Code, is amended by
6773 adding Chapter 7963 to read as follows:
6874 CHAPTER 7963. HIDALGO COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
6975 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
7076 Sec. 7963.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "district"
7177 means the Hidalgo County Municipal Utility District No. 1.
7278 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
7379 Sec. 7963.051. EMINENT DOMAIN. (a) The district may
7480 exercise the power of eminent domain as provided by this section
7581 only if the district submits a letter to the comptroller not later
7682 than December 31, 2019, in accordance with the requirements of
7783 Section 2206.101(b), Government Code, other than the requirement
7884 that the letter be submitted by the date specified by that
7985 subsection.
8086 (b) Notwithstanding the expiration of the district's
8187 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain under Section
8288 2206.101(c), Government Code, the district may exercise the power
8389 of eminent domain as provided by law applicable to the district on
8490 or after the 90th day after the date the district submits a letter
8591 in accordance with Subsection (a).
8692 SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. As provided by Section 17(c),
8793 Article I, Texas Constitution, this Act takes effect only on a
8894 two-thirds vote of all the members elected to each house. If this
8995 Act receives the vote necessary to take effect, this Act takes
9096 effect September 1, 2019.
91- ______________________________ ______________________________
92- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
93- I certify that H.B. No. 1019 was passed by the House on May
94- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 20, 2 present, not
95- voting.
96- ______________________________
97- Chief Clerk of the House
98- I certify that H.B. No. 1019 was passed by the Senate on May
99- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
100- ______________________________
101- Secretary of the Senate
102- APPROVED: _____________________
103- Date
104- _____________________
105- Governor
97+ * * * * *