1 | | - | H.B. No. 1026 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bohac, Allison (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1026 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1026 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to instruction in positive character traits in public |
---|
6 | 14 | | schools. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 29.906, Education Code, |
---|
9 | 17 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 29.906. CHARACTER TRAITS INSTRUCTION [EDUCATION |
---|
11 | 19 | | PROGRAM]. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 29.906, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
13 | 21 | | amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (g) to |
---|
14 | 22 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (a) The State Board of Education shall integrate positive |
---|
16 | 24 | | character traits into the essential knowledge and skills adopted |
---|
17 | 25 | | for kindergarten through grade 12, as appropriate [A school |
---|
18 | 26 | | district may provide a character education program]. |
---|
19 | 27 | | (b) The State Board of Education must include the following |
---|
20 | 28 | | [A character education program under this section must: |
---|
21 | 29 | | [(1) stress] positive character traits [, such as]: |
---|
22 | 30 | | (1) [(A)] courage; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (2) [(B)] trustworthiness, including honesty, |
---|
24 | 32 | | reliability, punctuality, and loyalty; |
---|
25 | 33 | | (3) [(C)] integrity; |
---|
26 | 34 | | (4) [(D)] respect and courtesy; |
---|
27 | 35 | | (5) [(E)] responsibility, including accountability, |
---|
28 | 36 | | diligence, perseverance, and self-control; |
---|
29 | 37 | | (6) [(F)] fairness, including justice and freedom |
---|
30 | 38 | | from prejudice; |
---|
31 | 39 | | (7) [(G)] caring, including kindness, empathy, |
---|
32 | 40 | | compassion, consideration, patience, generosity, and charity; |
---|
33 | 41 | | (8) [(H)] good citizenship, including patriotism, |
---|
34 | 42 | | concern for the common good and the community, and respect for |
---|
35 | 43 | | authority and the law; [and] |
---|
36 | 44 | | (9) [(I)] school pride; and |
---|
37 | 45 | | (10) gratitude[; |
---|
38 | 46 | | [(2) use integrated teaching strategies; and |
---|
39 | 47 | | [(3) be age appropriate]. |
---|
40 | 48 | | (c) Each school district and open-enrollment charter school |
---|
41 | 49 | | must adopt a character education program that includes the positive |
---|
42 | 50 | | character traits listed in Subsection (b). In developing or |
---|
43 | 51 | | selecting a character education program under this section, a |
---|
44 | 52 | | school district shall consult with a committee selected by the |
---|
45 | 53 | | district that consists of: |
---|
46 | 54 | | (1) parents of district students; |
---|
47 | 55 | | (2) educators; and |
---|
48 | 56 | | (3) other members of the community, including |
---|
49 | 57 | | community leaders. |
---|
50 | 58 | | (g) The State Board of Education may adopt rules as |
---|
51 | 59 | | necessary to implement this section. |
---|
52 | 60 | | SECTION 3. This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020 |
---|
53 | 61 | | school year. |
---|
54 | 62 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
55 | 63 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
56 | 64 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
57 | 65 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
58 | 66 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
61 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1026 was passed by the House on April |
---|
62 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
63 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
64 | | - | No. 1026 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 6, |
---|
65 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
68 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1026 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
69 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
70 | | - | 0. |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
73 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Date |
---|
75 | | - | __________________ |
---|
76 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 67 | + | * * * * * |
---|