1 | | - | H.B. No. 1028 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1028 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1028 By: Huffman |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to increasing the criminal penalties for certain offenses |
---|
6 | 14 | | committed in a disaster area or an evacuated area. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 12.50(b) and (c), Penal Code, are |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (b) The increase in punishment authorized by this section |
---|
11 | 19 | | applies only to an offense under: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) Section 22.01; |
---|
13 | 21 | | (2) Section 28.02; |
---|
14 | 22 | | (3) Section 29.02; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (4) [(3)] Section 30.02; |
---|
16 | 24 | | (5) Section 30.03; |
---|
17 | 25 | | (6) Section 30.04; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (7) Section 30.05; and |
---|
19 | 27 | | (8) [(4)] Section 31.03. |
---|
20 | 28 | | (c) If an offense listed under Subsection (b)(1), (5), (6), |
---|
21 | 29 | | (7), or (8) [(4)] is punishable as a Class A misdemeanor, the |
---|
22 | 30 | | minimum term of confinement for the offense is increased to 180 |
---|
23 | 31 | | days. If an offense listed under Subsection (b)(2), [(b)(3) or] |
---|
24 | 32 | | (4), or (8) is punishable as a felony of the first degree, the |
---|
25 | 33 | | punishment for that offense may not be increased under this |
---|
26 | 34 | | section. |
---|
27 | 35 | | SECTION 2. Section 12.50(d), Penal Code, is repealed. |
---|
28 | 36 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
29 | 37 | | to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
30 | 38 | | An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
31 | 39 | | governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and |
---|
32 | 40 | | the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For |
---|
33 | 41 | | purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the |
---|
34 | 42 | | effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred |
---|
35 | 43 | | before that date. |
---|
36 | 44 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1028 was passed by the House on April |
---|
40 | | - | 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
41 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
42 | | - | No. 1028 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, |
---|
43 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1028 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 1. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 45 | + | * * * * * |
---|