Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1048 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1048
1+By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1048
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1048 By: Zaffirini
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the use of a county early voting polling place by a
614 political subdivision.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 85.010, Election Code, is amended by
917 adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
1018 follows:
1119 (a-1) In this section, "eligible county polling place"
1220 means an early voting polling place, other than a polling place
1321 established under Section 85.062(e), established by a county.
1422 (b) A political subdivision that holds an election
1523 described by Subsection (a):
1624 (1) shall designate as an early voting polling place
1725 for the election an eligible county [any early voting] polling
1826 place[, other than a polling place established under Section
1927 85.062(e), established by the county and] located in the political
2028 subdivision; and
2129 (2) may not designate as an early voting polling place
2230 a location other than an eligible county polling place unless each
2331 eligible county polling place located in the political subdivision
2432 is designated as an early voting polling place by the political
2533 subdivision.
2634 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
2735 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
2836 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
2937 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3038 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
31- ______________________________ ______________________________
32- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
33- I certify that H.B. No. 1048 was passed by the House on April
34- 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
35- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
36- No. 1048 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
37- 1 present, not voting.
38- ______________________________
39- Chief Clerk of the House
40- I certify that H.B. No. 1048 was passed by the Senate, with
41- amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
42- 0.
43- ______________________________
44- Secretary of the Senate
45- APPROVED: __________________
46- Date
47- __________________
48- Governor
39+ * * * * *