Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019