Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019