Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1065 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1065
1+By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1065
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
3+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
4+ Education; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
6+ May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1065 By: Taylor
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the establishment of a rural resident physician grant
614 program.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Chapter 58A, Education Code, is amended by
917 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
1018 SUBCHAPTER E. RURAL RESIDENT PHYSICIAN GRANT PROGRAM
1119 Sec. 58A.081. RURAL RESIDENT PHYSICIAN GRANT PROGRAM. (a)
1220 The board shall administer the Rural Resident Physician Grant
1321 Program as a competitive grant program to encourage the creation of
1422 new graduate medical education positions in rural and
1523 nonmetropolitan areas, with particular emphasis on the creation of
1624 rural training tracks. The board shall award grants to new or
1725 expanded physician residency programs at teaching hospitals and
1826 other appropriate health care entities according to the program
1927 criteria established under this section.
2028 (b) The board shall establish criteria for the grant program
2129 in consultation with one or more physicians, including a physician
2230 who practices in a rural area of this state, teaching hospitals,
2331 medical schools, and independent physician residency programs, and
2432 with other persons considered appropriate by the board. The
2533 program criteria must take into account whether a rural or
2634 nonmetropolitan area has the resources sufficient to support a
2735 physician residency program in a manner that would satisfy
2836 applicable residency program accreditation requirements.
2937 (c) The board may provide grants only to support a physician
3038 residency program:
3139 (1) that provides the level of medical care that is
3240 most needed in a rural or nonmetropolitan area; and
3341 (2) until the program becomes eligible for federal
3442 grant funding.
3543 (d) Grant funds awarded under this section may be used only
3644 to pay direct costs associated with creating or maintaining a
3745 residency position, including the salary of the resident physician.
3846 (e) Each grant application must:
3947 (1) specify the number of residency positions expected
4048 to be created or maintained with the grant money;
4149 (2) specify the grant amount requested for each year;
4250 (3) include documentation of infrastructure and
4351 staffing to satisfy applicable residency program accreditation
4452 requirements;
4553 (4) include documentation that the residency program
4654 will set a primary goal of producing physicians who are prepared for
4755 practice in a rural area; and
4856 (5) include evidence of support for residency training
4957 by sponsoring institutions and the community.
5058 (f) The board shall award grants for all residency positions
5159 awarded a grant under this section in the preceding year before
5260 awarding a grant for a residency position that did not receive a
5361 grant in the preceding year, provided that the applicable grant
5462 recipient from the preceding year complies with all conditions of
5563 the grant as described by Subsection (g) and satisfies the grant
5664 eligibility requirements.
5765 (g) The board shall monitor physician residency programs
5866 receiving grants as necessary to ensure compliance with the grant
5967 program and shall require the return of any unused grant money by,
6068 or shall decline to award additional grants to, a residency program
6169 that receives a grant but fails to:
6270 (1) create and fill, within a reasonable period, the
6371 number of residency positions proposed in the program's grant
6472 application; or
6573 (2) satisfy any other conditions of the grant imposed
6674 by the board.
6775 (h) The board shall use money forfeited under Subsection (g)
6876 to award grants to other eligible applicants. With respect to the
6977 physician residency program forfeiting the grant, the board may
7078 restore grant money or award additional grants, as applicable, to
7179 the program as soon as practicable after the program satisfies all
7280 conditions of the grant.
7381 (i) The board shall adopt rules for the administration of
7482 the grant program. The rules must include:
7583 (1) administrative provisions governing:
7684 (A) eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
7785 (B) grant application procedures;
7886 (C) guidelines relating to grant amounts;
7987 (D) guidelines relating to the number of grants
8088 to be awarded each year, subject to available funds;
8189 (E) procedures for evaluating grant
8290 applications;
8391 (F) procedures for monitoring the use of grants;
8492 and
8593 (G) reporting requirements for grant recipients;
8694 (2) methods for tracking the effectiveness of grants;
8795 and
8896 (3) any conditions relating to the receipt and use of a
8997 grant as considered appropriate by the board.
9098 SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
9199 date of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
92100 shall adopt rules for the implementation and administration of the
93101 grant program established under Subchapter E, Chapter 58A,
94102 Education Code, as added by this Act. The board may adopt the
95103 initial rules in the manner provided by law for emergency rules.
96104 (b) Not later than October 1, 2019, the Texas Higher
97105 Education Coordinating Board shall establish the grant program
98106 required by Subchapter E, Chapter 58A, Education Code, as added by
99107 this Act, and shall begin to award grants under that program not
100108 later than January 1, 2020.
101109 SECTION 3. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board is
102110 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
103111 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
104112 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
105113 purpose, the coordinating board may, but is not required to,
106114 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
107115 available for that purpose.
108116 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
109117 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
110118 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
111119 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
112120 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
113- ______________________________ ______________________________
114- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
115- I certify that H.B. No. 1065 was passed by the House on April
116- 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 12, 1 present, not
117- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
118- No. 1065 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 11,
119- 1 present, not voting.
120- ______________________________
121- Chief Clerk of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 1065 was passed by the Senate, with
123- amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
124- 2.
125- ______________________________
126- Secretary of the Senate
127- APPROVED: __________________
128- Date
129- __________________
130- Governor
121+ * * * * *