Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019