Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1067 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2019

                    By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1067
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019;
 April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 1, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1067 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the omission of a deceased candidate from the ballot in
 certain elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 145.096(a), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) or Section
 145.098(b), a candidate's name shall be placed on the ballot if the
 candidate:
 (1)  dies on or after the second day before the deadline
 for filing the candidate's application for a place on the ballot;
 (2)  is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the fifth
 day after the deadline for filing the candidate's application for a
 place on the ballot, in an election subject to Section 145.092(a);
 (3)  is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the 57th day
 before election day, in an election subject to Section 145.092(b);
 or
 (4)  is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the 71st day
 before election day, in an election subject to Section 145.092(f).
 SECTION 2.  Section 145.098, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 145.098.  WITHDRAWAL OR DEATH OF CANDIDATE BEFORE
 BALLOTS ARE PREPARED. (a)  If a candidate files a withdrawal
 request after the deadline prescribed by Section 145.092, and the
 candidate complies with each requirement under Section 145.001
 except that the candidate's filing to withdraw is untimely, the
 authority responsible for preparing the ballots may choose to omit
 the candidate from the ballot if the ballots have not been prepared
 at the time the candidate files the withdrawal request.
 (b)  If a candidate dies on or before the deadline for filing
 an application for a place on the ballot:
 (1)  the authority responsible for preparing the
 ballots may choose to omit the candidate from the ballot; and
 (2)  if the authority omits the candidate's name under
 Subdivision (1), the filing deadline for an application for a place
 on the ballot for the office sought by the candidate is extended
 until the fifth day after the filing deadline.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an election for which an application for a place on the ballot is
 due on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *