1 | | - | H.B. No. 1067 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1067 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 4, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 5 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, |
---|
| 6 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1067 By: Birdwell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the omission of a deceased candidate from the ballot in |
---|
6 | 14 | | certain elections. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 145.096(a), Election Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) or Section |
---|
11 | 19 | | 145.098(b), a candidate's name shall be placed on the ballot if the |
---|
12 | 20 | | candidate: |
---|
13 | 21 | | (1) dies on or after the second day before the deadline |
---|
14 | 22 | | for filing the candidate's application for a place on the ballot; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the fifth |
---|
16 | 24 | | day after the deadline for filing the candidate's application for a |
---|
17 | 25 | | place on the ballot, in an election subject to Section 145.092(a); |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the 57th day |
---|
19 | 27 | | before election day, in an election subject to Section 145.092(b); |
---|
20 | 28 | | or |
---|
21 | 29 | | (4) is declared ineligible after 5 p.m. of the 71st day |
---|
22 | 30 | | before election day, in an election subject to Section 145.092(f). |
---|
23 | 31 | | SECTION 2. Section 145.098, Election Code, is amended to |
---|
24 | 32 | | read as follows: |
---|
25 | 33 | | Sec. 145.098. WITHDRAWAL OR DEATH OF CANDIDATE BEFORE |
---|
26 | 34 | | BALLOTS ARE PREPARED. (a) If a candidate files a withdrawal |
---|
27 | 35 | | request after the deadline prescribed by Section 145.092, and the |
---|
28 | 36 | | candidate complies with each requirement under Section 145.001 |
---|
29 | 37 | | except that the candidate's filing to withdraw is untimely, the |
---|
30 | 38 | | authority responsible for preparing the ballots may choose to omit |
---|
31 | 39 | | the candidate from the ballot if the ballots have not been prepared |
---|
32 | 40 | | at the time the candidate files the withdrawal request. |
---|
33 | 41 | | (b) If a candidate dies on or before the deadline for filing |
---|
34 | 42 | | an application for a place on the ballot: |
---|
35 | 43 | | (1) the authority responsible for preparing the |
---|
36 | 44 | | ballots may choose to omit the candidate from the ballot; and |
---|
37 | 45 | | (2) if the authority omits the candidate's name under |
---|
38 | 46 | | Subdivision (1), the filing deadline for an application for a place |
---|
39 | 47 | | on the ballot for the office sought by the candidate is extended |
---|
40 | 48 | | until the fifth day after the filing deadline. |
---|
41 | 49 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
42 | 50 | | an election for which an application for a place on the ballot is |
---|
43 | 51 | | due on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
44 | 52 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 53 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 54 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 55 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 56 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1067 was passed by the House on April |
---|
52 | | - | 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 5, 1 present, not |
---|
53 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
54 | | - | No. 1067 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 104, Nays 2, |
---|
55 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1067 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | | - | amendments, on May 8, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
62 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Date |
---|
64 | | - | __________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 57 | + | * * * * * |
---|