Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1078 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1078
1+By: Oliverson (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 1078
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
3+ April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1;
6+ May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1078 By: Creighton
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to waiving certain driver's license and handgun license
614 fees for certain applicants who hold a certification in
715 cardiopulmonary resuscitation.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
1018 amended by adding Section 411.1954 to read as follows:
1119 Sec. 411.1954. WAIVER OF CERTAIN FEES FOR CERTAIN
1220 APPLICANTS WHO HOLD CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION CERTIFICATION.
1321 (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter, the
1422 department shall waive any fee required for the issuance of an
1523 original or renewed license under this subchapter if at the time of
1624 the application the applicant for the license submits to the
1725 department satisfactory evidence that the applicant:
1826 (1) holds a current certification in cardiopulmonary
1927 resuscitation issued by the American Heart Association, the
2028 American Red Cross, or another nationally recognized association;
2129 and
2230 (2) is not required to hold the certification
2331 described by Subdivision (1) as a condition of obtaining or
2432 maintaining employment or an occupational license.
2533 (b) For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), "occupational
2634 license" means a license, certificate, registration, permit, or
2735 other form of authorization that a person must obtain to practice or
2836 engage in a particular business, occupation, or profession.
2937 SECTION 2. Subchapter I, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
3038 is amended by adding Section 521.1812 to read as follows:
3139 Sec. 521.1812. WAIVER OF CERTAIN FEES FOR CERTAIN
3240 APPLICANTS WHO HOLD CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION CERTIFICATION.
3341 (a) A person is exempt from the payment of any fee for the issuance
3442 of an original or renewal driver's license, as provided under this
3543 chapter, if at the time of the application for an original or
3644 renewal driver's license the person submits to the department
3745 satisfactory evidence that the person:
3846 (1) holds a current certification in cardiopulmonary
3947 resuscitation issued by the American Heart Association, the
4048 American Red Cross, or another nationally recognized association;
4149 and
4250 (2) is not required to hold the certification
4351 described by Subdivision (1) as a condition of obtaining or
4452 maintaining employment or an occupational license.
4553 (b) For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), "occupational
4654 license" means a license, certificate, registration, permit, or
4755 other form of authorization that a person must obtain to practice or
4856 engage in a particular business, occupation, or profession.
4957 (c) The department shall establish a record of the amount of
5058 the fees waived under this section that would otherwise be
5159 deposited to the credit of the Texas mobility fund.
5260 (d) On or before the fifth workday of each month, the
5361 department, using available funds, shall remit to the comptroller
5462 for deposit to the credit of the Texas mobility fund general revenue
5563 in an amount equal to the amount of the fees described by Subsection
5664 (c) in the preceding month.
5765 SECTION 3. (a) Section 411.1954, Government Code, as added
5866 by this Act, applies only to an application for an original or
5967 renewed license to carry a handgun submitted on or after the
6068 effective date of this Act. An application submitted before the
6169 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
6270 application was submitted, and the former law is continued in
6371 effect for that purpose.
6472 (b) Section 521.1812, Transportation Code, as added by this
6573 Act, applies only to an application for an original or renewal
6674 driver's license submitted on or after the effective date of this
6775 Act. An application submitted before the effective date of this Act
6876 is governed by the law in effect when the application was submitted,
6977 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
7078 SECTION 4. The Department of Public Safety of the State of
7179 Texas is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
7280 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
7381 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
7482 purpose, the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas may,
7583 but is not required to, implement a provision of this Act using
7684 other appropriations available for that purpose.
7785 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
78- ______________________________ ______________________________
79- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 1078 was passed by the House on April
81- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 2, 1 present, not
82- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
83- No. 1078 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 6,
84- 3 present, not voting.
85- ______________________________
86- Chief Clerk of the House
87- I certify that H.B. No. 1078 was passed by the Senate, with
88- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
89- 2.
90- ______________________________
91- Secretary of the Senate
92- APPROVED: __________________
93- Date
94- __________________
95- Governor
86+ * * * * *