Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019