House | 05/09/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Record vote RV#1244 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Failed to pass to engrossment | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amended 2-Dutton | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amendment withdrawn 1-Stickland | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Postponed 5/9/19 7:30 PM | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Postponed 5/9/19 5:30 PM | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Postponed 5/9/19 4:15 PM | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amended 1-Stickland | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Stickland | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Postponed 5/8/19 11:30 PM | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/28/2019 | Filed |