Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB114 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 114
1+By: White, Minjarez, Dominguez H.B. No. 114
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
4+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 26, 2019, reported
6+ favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 26, 2019,
7+ sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to providing public high school students information
614 regarding the availability of college credit awarded for military
715 experience, education, and training obtained during military
816 service.
917 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1018 SECTION 1. Section 33.007, Education Code, is amended by
1119 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-2) to read as
1220 follows:
1321 (b) During the first school year a student is enrolled in a
1422 high school or at the high school level in an open-enrollment
1523 charter school, and again during each year of a student's
1624 enrollment in high school or at the high school level, a school
1725 counselor shall provide information about postsecondary education
1826 to the student and the student's parent or guardian. The
1927 information must include information regarding:
2028 (1) the importance of postsecondary education;
2129 (2) the advantages of earning an endorsement and a
2230 performance acknowledgment and completing the distinguished level
2331 of achievement under the foundation high school program under
2432 Section 28.025;
2533 (3) the disadvantages of taking courses to prepare for
2634 a high school equivalency examination relative to the benefits of
2735 taking courses leading to a high school diploma;
2836 (4) financial aid eligibility;
2937 (5) instruction on how to apply for federal financial
3038 aid;
3139 (6) the center for financial aid information
3240 established under Section 61.0776;
3341 (7) the automatic admission of certain students to
3442 general academic teaching institutions as provided by Section
3543 51.803;
3644 (8) the eligibility and academic performance
3745 requirements for the TEXAS Grant as provided by Subchapter M,
3846 Chapter 56;
3947 (9) the availability of programs in the district under
4048 which a student may earn college credit, including advanced
4149 placement programs, dual credit programs, joint high school and
4250 college credit programs, and international baccalaureate programs;
4351 [and]
4452 (10) the availability of education and training
4553 vouchers and tuition and fee waivers to attend an institution of
4654 higher education as provided by Section 54.366 for a student who is
4755 or was previously in the conservatorship of the Department of
4856 Family and Protective Services; and
4957 (11) the availability of college credit awarded by
5058 institutions of higher education to veterans and military
5159 servicemembers for military experience, education, and training
5260 obtained during military service as described by the informational
5361 materials developed under Section 302.0031(h), Labor Code.
5462 (b-2) Information provided under Subsection (b)(11) must
5563 explain to any student who is enlisted or intends to enlist in the
5664 armed forces of the United States the informational materials
5765 developed under Section 302.0031(h), Labor Code.
5866 SECTION 2. Section 302.0031, Labor Code, is amended by
5967 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
6068 (h) For purposes of Section 33.007(b)(11), Education Code,
6169 the commission, in cooperation with the Texas Higher Education
6270 Coordinating Board, shall develop and annually make available to
6371 each school district and each open-enrollment charter school that
6472 offers a high school program informational materials regarding the
6573 availability of college credit awarded by institutions of higher
6674 education to veterans and military servicemembers for military
6775 experience, education, and training obtained during military
6876 service, including information regarding the program under this
6977 section.
7078 SECTION 3. Section 33.007, Education Code, as amended by
7179 this Act, applies beginning with the 2020-2021 school year.
7280 SECTION 4. Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas
7381 Workforce Commission, in cooperation with the Texas Higher
7482 Education Coordinating Board, shall develop and make available to
7583 each school district and each open-enrollment charter school that
7684 offers a high school program the informational materials required
7785 under Section 302.0031(h), Labor Code, as added by this Act.
7886 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7987 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8088 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8189 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8290 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
83- ______________________________ ______________________________
84- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
85- I certify that H.B. No. 114 was passed by the House on April
86- 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 1, 1 present, not
87- voting.
88- ______________________________
89- Chief Clerk of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 114 was passed by the Senate on May 3,
91- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
92- ______________________________
93- Secretary of the Senate
94- APPROVED: _____________________
95- Date
96- _____________________
97- Governor
91+ * * * * *