1 | | - | H.B. No. 1174 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Reynolds, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1174 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, |
---|
| 5 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1174 By: Alvarado |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the authority of certain county assistance districts to |
---|
6 | 14 | | provide a grant or loan. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 387.006(a), Local Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) A district may: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (1) perform any act necessary to the full exercise of |
---|
12 | 20 | | the district's functions; |
---|
13 | 21 | | (2) accept a grant or loan from: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (A) the United States; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (B) an agency or political subdivision of this |
---|
16 | 24 | | state; or |
---|
17 | 25 | | (C) a public or private person; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) acquire, sell, lease, convey, or otherwise dispose |
---|
19 | 27 | | of property or an interest in property under terms determined by the |
---|
20 | 28 | | district; |
---|
21 | 29 | | (4) employ necessary personnel; |
---|
22 | 30 | | (5) adopt rules to govern the operation of the |
---|
23 | 31 | | district and its employees and property; [and] |
---|
24 | 32 | | (6) enter into agreements with municipalities |
---|
25 | 33 | | necessary or convenient to achieve the district's purposes, |
---|
26 | 34 | | including agreements regarding the duration, rate, and allocation |
---|
27 | 35 | | between the district and the municipality of sales and use taxes; |
---|
28 | 36 | | and |
---|
29 | 37 | | (7) if the district is created by a county with a |
---|
30 | 38 | | population of more than 580,000 that borders a county with a |
---|
31 | 39 | | population of more than four million, provide a grant or loan to a |
---|
32 | 40 | | political subdivision to assist in funding the performance of one |
---|
33 | 41 | | or more functions a district is authorized to perform under this |
---|
34 | 42 | | chapter. |
---|
35 | 43 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1174 was passed by the House on May |
---|
39 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 32, 2 present, not |
---|
40 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
41 | | - | No. 1174 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 48, |
---|
42 | | - | 3 present, not voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1174 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
46 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays |
---|
47 | | - | 7. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Date |
---|
52 | | - | __________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|