Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB121 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2019

                    By: Swanson, et al. H.B. No. 121
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton, Hall)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a defense to prosecution for the offense of trespass by
 certain persons carrying handguns.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30.06, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the license holder was personally given notice by oral
 communication described by Subsection (b) and promptly departed
 from the property.
 SECTION 2.  Section 30.07, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the license holder was personally given notice by oral
 communication described by Subsection (b) and promptly departed
 from the property.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *