Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1218 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1218
1+By: Klick, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1218
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2019;
3+ April 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the distribution of benefits under the supplemental
612 nutrition assistance program.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 33.002, Human Resources Code, is amended
915 by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
1016 (c-1) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a
1117 schedule for the distribution of supplemental nutrition assistance
1218 program benefits that ensures the even distribution of the benefits
1319 each month over a 28-day period.
1420 SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, the executive
1521 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
1622 adopt, modify, or repeal rules as necessary to implement Section
1723 33.002(c-1), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
1824 SECTION 3. A distribution schedule adopted as required by
1925 Section 33.002(c-1), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act,
2026 applies only to the distribution of supplemental nutrition
2127 assistance program benefits to a recipient whose initial
2228 determination of eligibility under Chapter 33, Human Resources
2329 Code, for those benefits is made on or after September 1, 2020. The
2430 distribution of benefits to a recipient whose initial determination
2531 of eligibility under Chapter 33, Human Resources Code, is made
2632 before September 1, 2020, is governed by the distribution schedule
2733 in effect immediately preceding that date, and the former law is
2834 continued in effect for that purpose.
2935 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
3036 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
3137 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
3238 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
3339 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
3440 waiver or authorization is granted.
3541 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
3642 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
3743 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3844 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3945 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
40- ______________________________ ______________________________
41- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
42- I certify that H.B. No. 1218 was passed by the House on March
43- 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
44- voting.
45- ______________________________
46- Chief Clerk of the House
47- I certify that H.B. No. 1218 was passed by the Senate on May
48- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
49- ______________________________
50- Secretary of the Senate
51- APPROVED: _____________________
52- Date
53- _____________________
54- Governor
46+ * * * * *