Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1225 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1225
1+By: Guillen H.B. No. 1225
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez, Miles)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
4+ April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
5+ Human Services; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following
6+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the re-creation of the Chronic Kidney Disease Task
613 Force.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Glenda Dawson Act.
916 SECTION 2. The state finds that the treatment of chronic
1017 kidney disease is a tremendous expense and that the early diagnosis
1118 and effective treatment of chronic kidney disease can prolong lives
1219 and delay the high cost of medical treatment, including dialysis
1320 and transplantation.
1421 SECTION 3. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
1522 amended by adding Chapter 83 to read as follows:
1623 CHAPTER 83. CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE TASK FORCE
1724 Sec. 83.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "task force"
1825 means the Chronic Kidney Disease Task Force.
1926 Sec. 83.002. CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE TASK FORCE. (a) The
2027 Chronic Kidney Disease Task Force is composed of:
2128 (1) 20 members appointed by the governor as follows:
2229 (A) one family practice physician;
2330 (B) one pathologist;
2431 (C) one nephrologist from a nephrology
2532 department of a state medical school;
2633 (D) one nephrologist in private practice;
2734 (E) one representative from the National Kidney
2835 Foundation;
2936 (F) one representative from the Texas Kidney
3037 Foundation;
3138 (G) one representative from the South Plains
3239 Kidney Foundation of West Texas;
3340 (H) one representative from the Texas Renal
3441 Coalition;
3542 (I) one representative from the commission's
3643 Kidney Health Care Program;
3744 (J) one representative of an insurer that issues
3845 a preferred provider benefit plan or of a health maintenance
3946 organization;
4047 (K) one representative of clinical laboratories;
4148 (L) one representative of private renal care
4249 providers;
4350 (M) one pediatrician in private practice;
4451 (N) one kidney transplant surgeon;
4552 (O) one primary care physician;
4653 (P) one licensed and certified renal dietitian;
4754 (Q) one certified nephrology nurse;
4855 (R) one representative from a health care system;
4956 (S) one representative of the commission whose
5057 duties involve the state Medicaid program; and
5158 (T) one end stage renal disease expert;
5259 (2) two members of the senate appointed by the
5360 lieutenant governor; and
5461 (3) two members of the house of representatives
5562 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
5663 (b) The governor shall designate a member of the task force
5764 to serve as the presiding officer of the task force. The presiding
5865 officer serves at the will of the governor.
5966 (c) Appointments to the task force shall be made without
6067 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
6168 national origin of the appointees.
6269 Sec. 83.003. DUTIES. The task force shall:
6370 (1) coordinate implementation of the state's
6471 cost-effective plan for prevention, early screening, diagnosis,
6572 and management of chronic kidney disease for the state's population
6673 through national, state, and local partners; and
6774 (2) educate health care professionals on the use of
6875 clinical practice guidelines for screening, detecting, diagnosing,
6976 treating, and managing chronic kidney disease, its comorbidities,
7077 and its complications based on the Kidney Disease Outcomes Quality
7178 Initiative Clinical Practice Guidelines for Chronic Kidney
7279 Disease.
7380 Sec. 83.004. REIMBURSEMENT. A member of the task force may
7481 receive reimbursement for travel expenses as provided by Section
7582 2110.004, Government Code.
7683 Sec. 83.005. ASSISTANCE. The commission shall provide
7784 administrative support to the task force, including necessary staff
7885 and meeting facilities.
7986 Sec. 83.006. REPORT. Not later than January 1 of each
8087 odd-numbered year, the task force shall submit its findings and
8188 recommendations to:
8289 (1) the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of
8390 the house of representatives; and
8491 (2) the presiding officers of the appropriate standing
8592 committees of the legislature with jurisdiction over health issues.
8693 Sec. 83.007. FUNDING. (a) The task force, through the
8794 commission, may accept gifts and grants from individuals, private
8895 or public organizations, or federal or local funds to support the
8996 task force.
9097 (b) The commission shall investigate any potential sources
9198 of funding from federal grants or programs.
9299 Sec. 83.008. APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Except as
93100 specifically provided by this chapter, Chapter 2110, Government
94101 Code, does not apply to the task force.
95102 Sec. 83.009. TASK FORCE REVIEW AND ABOLISHMENT. (a) The
96103 commission shall review the continued need for the task force at
97104 least once every five years.
98105 (b) If the commission determines the task force is no longer
99106 needed and should be abolished, the commission shall publish notice
100107 of its decision in the Texas Register and on the commission's
101108 Internet website.
102109 (c) The task force is abolished on the date stated in the
103110 notice required by Subsection (b).
104111 SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the governor,
105112 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives
106113 shall appoint the members to the Chronic Kidney Disease Task Force
107114 as required by Section 83.002, Health and Safety Code, as added by
108115 this Act.
109116 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
110- ______________________________ ______________________________
111- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
112- I certify that H.B. No. 1225 was passed by the House on April
113- 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 4, 2 present, not
114- voting.
115- ______________________________
116- Chief Clerk of the House
117- I certify that H.B. No. 1225 was passed by the Senate on May
118- 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5.
119- ______________________________
120- Secretary of the Senate
121- APPROVED: _____________________
122- Date
123- _____________________
124- Governor
117+ * * * * *