1 | | - | H.B. No. 1244 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 1244 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 21, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | March 27, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 15, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1244 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the United States history end-of-course assessment |
---|
6 | 14 | | instrument administered to public high school students and |
---|
7 | 15 | | reporting requirements for that assessment instrument. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 18 | | adding Subsection (c-7) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (c-7) The United States history end-of-course assessment |
---|
12 | 20 | | instrument adopted under Subsection (c) must include 10 questions |
---|
13 | 21 | | randomly selected by the agency from the civics test administered |
---|
14 | 22 | | by the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services as part |
---|
15 | 23 | | of the naturalization process under the federal Immigration and |
---|
16 | 24 | | Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.). The agency shall: |
---|
17 | 25 | | (1) ensure that the questions included in the |
---|
18 | 26 | | assessment instrument align with the essential knowledge and skills |
---|
19 | 27 | | adopted for the United States history course for which the |
---|
20 | 28 | | instrument is administered; and |
---|
21 | 29 | | (2) annually issue a report: |
---|
22 | 30 | | (A) providing the questions included in the |
---|
23 | 31 | | assessment instrument under this subsection and the answers to |
---|
24 | 32 | | those questions; and |
---|
25 | 33 | | (B) detailing student performance on the |
---|
26 | 34 | | questions included in the assessment instrument under this |
---|
27 | 35 | | subsection, both statewide and disaggregated by school district and |
---|
28 | 36 | | campus. |
---|
29 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Section 39.023(c-7), Education Code, as added by |
---|
30 | 38 | | this Act, applies beginning with students who enter the ninth grade |
---|
31 | 39 | | during the 2019-2020 school year. |
---|
32 | 40 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 41 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 42 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 43 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 44 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1244 was passed by the House on March |
---|
40 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
41 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
42 | | - | No. 1244 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 1, |
---|
43 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1244 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 0. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Date |
---|
53 | | - | __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 45 | + | * * * * * |
---|