Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1251 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1251
1+By: Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 1251
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
4+ April 25, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Administration; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
7+ May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1251 By: Nichols
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to fraternal benefit societies in a hazardous financial
615 condition.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Section 885.311, Insurance Code, is amended by
918 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read
1019 as follows:
1120 (a) A fraternal benefit society shall provide in the
1221 fraternal benefit society's laws that if the society's reserves for
1322 any class of the society's benefit certificates become impaired,
1423 the society's supreme governing body or board of directors may
1524 require the certificate holders to pay the society an equitable
1625 proportion of the deficiency as determined by the governing body or
1726 board. The aggregate assessment for the impaired reserves may not
1827 exceed the total amount required to comply with Section 885.408.
1928 (d) Not later than the 90th day before the proposed
2029 effective date of an assessment under Subsection (a), the fraternal
2130 benefit society shall file with the department an application for
2231 approval of the assessment and a statement sworn to by the president
2332 and secretary or corresponding officers of the society. The
2433 statement must:
2534 (1) include:
2635 (A) the terms of the assessment, including the
2736 proposed effective date; and
2837 (B) a narrative statement of the financial
2938 condition of the fraternal benefit society; and
3039 (2) state that the assessment:
3140 (A) received approval by a majority vote of the
3241 supreme governing body or board of directors of the society; and
3342 (B) complies with the requirements of this
3443 section.
3544 (e) After the department receives a completed application,
3645 the commissioner may approve or disapprove the application. If the
3746 commissioner does not approve or disapprove the application before
3847 the 60th day after the date the department receives the completed
3948 application, the application is considered approved. The
4049 commissioner may impose an effective date earlier than the date
4150 requested in the application if the earlier effective date is in the
4251 best interests of the certificate holders.
4352 SECTION 2. Section 885.407, Insurance Code, is amended to
4453 read as follows:
4554 Sec. 885.407. SOLVENCY. (a) If a fraternal benefit society
4655 reports admissible assets greater than the society's liabilities in
4756 an amount that authorizes the commissioner to place the society
4857 under regulatory control and the commissioner reasonably believes
4958 the society's hazardous financial condition will not be promptly
5059 remedied without intervention by the department, the commissioner
5160 may order the society to promptly seek and negotiate an agreement to
5261 transfer in accordance with this section all benefit members,
5362 benefit certificates, assets, and liabilities of the society to
5463 another fraternal benefit society. A transfer under this section:
5564 (1) may be by merger, consolidation, assumption, or
5665 otherwise;
5766 (2) constitutes an entire novation of each benefit
5867 certificate transferred by the society in a hazardous financial
5968 condition, and the receiving society is legally and contractually
6069 responsible for each transferred certificate;
6170 (3) must conclude before the deadline set by the
6271 commissioner;
6372 (4) may be approved by a vote of the majority of the
6473 supreme governing body or board of directors of the society in a
6574 hazardous financial condition, notwithstanding Section
6675 885.063(a)(2)(C) or any provision of the society's laws to the
6776 contrary; and
6877 (5) is subject to approval by the commissioner.
6978 (b) Not later than the seventh day before the date the
7079 supreme governing body or board of directors of a fraternal benefit
7180 society votes on a transfer proposed under Subsection (a), the
7281 governing body or board shall provide the society's certificate
7382 holders written notice of and an opportunity to comment on the
7483 proposed transfer. If the governing body or board approves the
7584 transfer, the governing body or board shall provide the certificate
7685 holders' comments to the commissioner.
7786 (c) The supreme governing body or board of directors of a
7887 fraternal benefit society receiving benefit certificates pursuant
7988 to a transfer under an agreement described by Subsection (a) may
8089 suspend or modify qualifications for membership in the receiving
8190 society to the extent necessary to permit the society to accept the
8291 certificate holders of the society transferring certificates under
8392 the agreement, notwithstanding any provision of the receiving
8493 society's laws to the contrary.
8594 (d) The commissioner may grant to a fraternal benefit
8695 society that is not authorized to engage in the business of
8796 insurance in this state the authority to service benefit
8897 certificates transferred pursuant to Subsection (a) and fulfill all
8998 obligations to the holders of the certificates. Commissioner
9099 action under this subsection does not authorize the fraternal
91100 benefit society to otherwise engage in the business of insurance in
92101 this state.
93102 (e) A transfer under Subsection (a) may be made to an
94103 insurer that is not a fraternal benefit society if the insurer is
95104 authorized to engage in the business of insurance in this state. A
96105 holder of a certificate subject to a transfer as authorized by this
97106 subsection is deemed to agree that any term in the certificate,
98107 including a term that makes the certificate subject to the
99108 transferring society's laws or that provides for maintenance of the
100109 transferring society's solvency that is inconsistent with transfer
101110 to an insurer that is not a fraternal benefit society, is void on
102111 transfer of the certificate. The receiving insurer shall endorse
103112 on a form approved by the commissioner each benefit certificate
104113 received by a transfer made under this section to reflect any terms
105114 of the certificate voided by this subsection. A certificate
106115 holder's obligation to pay an outstanding assessment under Section
107116 885.311 that is not released under the transfer agreement is not
108117 released or voided by this subsection.
109118 (f) The commissioner may request the attorney general bring
110119 an action under Section 885.502 to terminate a fraternal benefit
111120 society that fails to comply with an order under this section or
112121 fails to remedy the financial condition that gave rise to the order.
113122 (g) The powers and authority of the commissioner under this
114123 section are cumulative and in addition to all other powers and
115124 authority to remediate the financial condition of a fraternal
116125 benefit society available to the commissioner. [A fraternal
117126 benefit society is considered solvent if its admissible assets are
118127 equal to or greater than its liabilities.]
119128 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
120129 885.311, Insurance Code, apply only to an assessment by a fraternal
121130 benefit society with an effective date on or after January 1, 2020.
122131 An assessment by a fraternal benefit society with an effective date
123132 before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it existed
124133 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
125134 continued in effect for that purpose.
126135 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
127- ______________________________ ______________________________
128- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 1251 was passed by the House on April
130- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 9, 2 present, not
131- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
132- No. 1251 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 119, Nays 22,
133- 3 present, not voting.
134- ______________________________
135- Chief Clerk of the House
136- I certify that H.B. No. 1251 was passed by the Senate, with
137- amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
138- 0.
139- ______________________________
140- Secretary of the Senate
141- APPROVED: __________________
142- Date
143- __________________
144- Governor
136+ * * * * *