1 | | - | H.B. No. 1256 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1256 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to access by certain persons to a first responder's |
---|
6 | 12 | | immunization history. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 161, Health and Safety |
---|
9 | 15 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 161.00708 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 161.00708. ACCESS TO FIRST RESPONDER IMMUNIZATION |
---|
11 | 17 | | HISTORY. (a) The department shall establish a process to provide |
---|
12 | 18 | | an employer of a first responder with direct access to the first |
---|
13 | 19 | | responder's immunization information in the immunization registry |
---|
14 | 20 | | for verification of the first responder's immunization history. |
---|
15 | 21 | | The process must require a first responder to provide electronic or |
---|
16 | 22 | | written consent before the employer is granted direct access to the |
---|
17 | 23 | | first responder's immunization information in the immunization |
---|
18 | 24 | | registry. A first responder may withdraw consent at any time. |
---|
19 | 25 | | (b) The department may establish a process to provide a |
---|
20 | 26 | | first responder with access to the first responder's immunization |
---|
21 | 27 | | information in the immunization registry. |
---|
22 | 28 | | SECTION 2. Section 161.008(d), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
23 | 29 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 30 | | (d) The department may release the data constituting an |
---|
25 | 31 | | immunization record for the individual to: |
---|
26 | 32 | | (1) any entity that is described by Subsection (c); |
---|
27 | 33 | | (2) a school or child care facility in which the |
---|
28 | 34 | | individual is enrolled; [or] |
---|
29 | 35 | | (3) a state agency having legal custody of the |
---|
30 | 36 | | individual; or |
---|
31 | 37 | | (4) an employer of a first responder or a first |
---|
32 | 38 | | responder in accordance with Section 161.00708. |
---|
33 | 39 | | SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2020, the executive |
---|
34 | 40 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
35 | 41 | | adopt rules as necessary to implement the changes in law made by |
---|
36 | 42 | | this Act. |
---|
37 | 43 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
40 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1256 was passed by the House on April |
---|
41 | | - | 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
42 | | - | voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1256 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
46 | | - | 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
49 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Date |
---|
51 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|