Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019