1 | | - | H.B. No. 1277 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Perez (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1277 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1277 By: Powell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to authorizing a wellness and success center fee at the |
---|
6 | 14 | | University of Houston-Downtown. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 54, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 54.5402 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 54.5402. WELLNESS AND SUCCESS CENTER FEE; UNIVERSITY |
---|
11 | 19 | | OF HOUSTON-DOWNTOWN. (a) The board of regents of the University of |
---|
12 | 20 | | Houston System may charge each student enrolled at the University |
---|
13 | 21 | | of Houston-Downtown a wellness and success center fee. The fee may |
---|
14 | 22 | | be used only for the purpose of financing, constructing, operating, |
---|
15 | 23 | | maintaining, improving, and equipping a wellness and success center |
---|
16 | 24 | | and for operating student wellness programs at the University of |
---|
17 | 25 | | Houston-Downtown. |
---|
18 | 26 | | (b) The wellness and success center fee may not be charged |
---|
19 | 27 | | unless the charging of the fee is approved by a majority vote of the |
---|
20 | 28 | | students enrolled at the university participating in a general |
---|
21 | 29 | | student election held for that purpose. |
---|
22 | 30 | | (c) The amount of a fee charged under this section may not |
---|
23 | 31 | | exceed: |
---|
24 | 32 | | (1) $150 per student for each regular semester; |
---|
25 | 33 | | (2) $75 per student for each summer session of eight |
---|
26 | 34 | | weeks or longer; or |
---|
27 | 35 | | (3) $50 per student for each term of the summer session |
---|
28 | 36 | | of less than eight weeks. |
---|
29 | 37 | | (d) Revenue from a fee charged under this section shall be |
---|
30 | 38 | | deposited to the credit of an account known as the University of |
---|
31 | 39 | | Houston-Downtown Wellness and Success Center Fee Account. |
---|
32 | 40 | | (e) The board of regents may increase the amount of a fee |
---|
33 | 41 | | charged under this section, except that the board may not increase |
---|
34 | 42 | | the amount of the fee to an amount that exceeds by more than 10 |
---|
35 | 43 | | percent the amount of the fee charged during the preceding academic |
---|
36 | 44 | | year unless the amount of the increase is approved by a majority |
---|
37 | 45 | | vote of students enrolled at the university participating in a |
---|
38 | 46 | | general student election held for that purpose. The ballot |
---|
39 | 47 | | proposition for such an election must clearly state the amount of |
---|
40 | 48 | | the proposed fee increase and describe the reason for the proposed |
---|
41 | 49 | | fee increase. |
---|
42 | 50 | | (f) The wellness and success center fee is not considered in |
---|
43 | 51 | | determining the maximum amount of student services fees that may be |
---|
44 | 52 | | charged under Section 54.503. |
---|
45 | 53 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
46 | 54 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
47 | 55 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
48 | 56 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
49 | 57 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1277 was passed by the House on April |
---|
53 | | - | 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 127, Nays 16, 2 present, not |
---|
54 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
55 | | - | No. 1277 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 19, |
---|
56 | | - | 3 present, not voting. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1277 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
60 | | - | amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays |
---|
61 | | - | 6. |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Date |
---|
66 | | - | __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 58 | + | * * * * * |
---|