Senate | 05/16/2019 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Co-sponsor authorized | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Record vote RV#278 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Amended 2-Phelan | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Amended 1-Phelan | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed |