Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019