1 | | - | H.B. No. 1346 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thompson of Brazoria, Zwiener H.B. No. 1346 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Powell) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 9, 2019, reported |
---|
| 6 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 7 | + | vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1346 By: Powell |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the eligibility requirements for the diesel emissions |
---|
6 | 15 | | reduction incentive program. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 386.104, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 18 | | amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and |
---|
10 | 19 | | (c-2) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | (c) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, for |
---|
12 | 21 | | [For] a proposed project as described by Section 386.102(b), other |
---|
13 | 22 | | than a project involving a marine vessel or engine, not less than 75 |
---|
14 | 23 | | percent of vehicle miles traveled or hours of operation projected |
---|
15 | 24 | | for the five years immediately following the award of a grant must |
---|
16 | 25 | | be projected to take place in a nonattainment area or affected |
---|
17 | 26 | | county of this state. The commission may set the minimum percentage |
---|
18 | 27 | | of vehicle miles traveled or hours of operation required to take |
---|
19 | 28 | | place in a nonattainment area or affected county at a percentage and |
---|
20 | 29 | | for a period that is different from the percentage and period |
---|
21 | 30 | | specified by this subsection, provided that the commission may not |
---|
22 | 31 | | set the minimum percentage at a level that is less than 55 percent. |
---|
23 | 32 | | The commission may [also] allow vehicle travel on highways and |
---|
24 | 33 | | roadways, or portions of a highway or roadway, designated by the |
---|
25 | 34 | | commission and located outside a nonattainment area or affected |
---|
26 | 35 | | county to count towards the percentage of use requirement in this |
---|
27 | 36 | | subsection. |
---|
28 | 37 | | (c-1) For a proposed project involving a marine vessel or |
---|
29 | 38 | | engine, the vessel or engine must be operated in the intercoastal |
---|
30 | 39 | | waterways or bays adjacent to a nonattainment area or affected |
---|
31 | 40 | | county of this state for a sufficient amount of time over the |
---|
32 | 41 | | lifetime of the project, as determined by the commission, to meet |
---|
33 | 42 | | the cost-effectiveness requirements of Section 386.105. |
---|
34 | 43 | | (c-2) For a proposed project involving non-road equipment |
---|
35 | 44 | | used for natural gas recovery purposes, the equipment must be |
---|
36 | 45 | | operated in a nonattainment area or affected county for a |
---|
37 | 46 | | sufficient amount of use over the lifetime of the project, as |
---|
38 | 47 | | determined by the commission, to meet the cost-effectiveness |
---|
39 | 48 | | requirements of Section 386.105. |
---|
40 | 49 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1346 was passed by the House on April |
---|
44 | | - | 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
46 | | - | No. 1346 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 21, |
---|
47 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1346 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
51 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
52 | | - | 1. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Date |
---|
57 | | - | __________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|