House | 05/10/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 239 | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/04/2019 | Filed |