Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1362 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2019

                            By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1362
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019;
 May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1362 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the caseloads of child protective services caseworkers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.05291 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.05291.  CASEWORKER CASELOAD SCORING SYSTEM AND
 REPORT. (a)  The department shall study the development and
 implementation of a scoring system to ensure equity in the
 distribution of cases among child protective services caseworkers.
 As part of the study, the department shall:
 (1)  consider:
 (A)  the procedures for assigning cases;
 (B)  the methods for managing caseloads; and
 (C)  the factors considered in assigning scores to
 caseloads and assigning cases to caseworkers;
 (2)  determine the appropriate guidelines for average
 caseloads for caseworkers in each department region;
 (3)  determine the cost to implement any scoring system
 developed by the department;
 (4)  ensure any scoring system developed by the
 department has the capability of producing monthly reports that
 include information for each department region; and
 (5)  compare the caseloads for caseworkers in each
 department region with:
 (A)  the caseloads of child protective services
 caseworkers in other states; or
 (B)  national best practices.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the department shall
 report the results of the study and any recommendations to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and chairs of the standing committees of the
 senate and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction
 over child protection issues.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *