Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Record vote RV#1321
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amended 1-Wray, Moody, Talarico, Ramos, and Bernal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Postponed 5/9/19 11:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|