1 | | - | H.B. No. 1386 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1386 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to training and development activities for persons who may |
---|
6 | 12 | | interact with an individual with autism or other pervasive |
---|
7 | 13 | | developmental disorder. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 114.013, Human Resources Code, is |
---|
10 | 16 | | amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c) and |
---|
11 | 17 | | (d) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 18 | | (b) As part of coordinating resources under Subsection (a), |
---|
13 | 19 | | the commission shall: |
---|
14 | 20 | | (1) collect and distribute information and research |
---|
15 | 21 | | regarding autism and other pervasive developmental disorders; |
---|
16 | 22 | | (2) conduct training and development activities for |
---|
17 | 23 | | persons who may interact with an individual with autism or another |
---|
18 | 24 | | pervasive developmental disorder in the course of their employment, |
---|
19 | 25 | | including school, medical, and [or] law enforcement personnel, and |
---|
20 | 26 | | personnel of the Department of Family and Protective Services; |
---|
21 | 27 | | (3) coordinate with local entities that provide |
---|
22 | 28 | | services to an individual with autism or another pervasive |
---|
23 | 29 | | developmental disorder; and |
---|
24 | 30 | | (4) provide support for families affected by autism |
---|
25 | 31 | | and other pervasive developmental disorders. |
---|
26 | 32 | | (c) The commission shall ensure that training and |
---|
27 | 33 | | development activities under this section are: |
---|
28 | 34 | | (1) evidenced-based; |
---|
29 | 35 | | (2) applicable to the professional role of each type |
---|
30 | 36 | | of personnel to be trained under Subsection (b)(2); and |
---|
31 | 37 | | (3) instructive regarding means of effectively |
---|
32 | 38 | | communicating and engaging with individuals with limited social or |
---|
33 | 39 | | verbal abilities. |
---|
34 | 40 | | (d) At least once every five years, in consultation with an |
---|
35 | 41 | | institution of higher education, the commission shall revise the |
---|
36 | 42 | | materials and methods for the training and development activities |
---|
37 | 43 | | to be provided under Subsection (b)(2). |
---|
38 | 44 | | SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2024, the executive |
---|
39 | 45 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
40 | 46 | | revise the materials and methods for the training and development |
---|
41 | 47 | | activities to be provided under Section 114.013(b)(2), Human |
---|
42 | 48 | | Resources Code, as amended by this Act. |
---|
43 | 49 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1386 was passed by the House on April |
---|
47 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
48 | | - | voting. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1386 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
52 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Date |
---|
57 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|