Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019