H.B. No. 1495 AN ACT relating to the ethics of certain public officials, including certain disclosure requirements. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. This Act shall be cited as the J D Lambright Local Government Ethics Reform Act. SECTION 2. Section 2252.908(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) This section applies only to a contract of a governmental entity or state agency that: (1) requires an action or vote by the governing body of the entity or agency before the contract may be signed; [or] (2) has a value of at least $1 million; or (3) is for services that would require a person to register as a lobbyist under Chapter 305. SECTION 3. Section 140.0045, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 140.0045. ITEMIZATION OF CERTAIN [PUBLIC NOTICE] EXPENDITURES REQUIRED IN CERTAIN POLITICAL SUBDIVISION BUDGETS. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), the proposed budget of a political subdivision must include, in a manner allowing for as clear a comparison as practicable between those expenditures in the proposed budget and actual expenditures for the same purpose in the preceding year, a line item indicating expenditures for: (1) notices required by law to be published in a newspaper by the political subdivision or a representative of the political subdivision; and (2) directly or indirectly influencing or attempting to influence the outcome of legislation or administrative action, as those terms are defined in Section 305.002, Government Code [that allows as clear a comparison as practicable between those expenditures in the proposed budget and actual expenditures for the same purpose in the preceding year]. (b) Subsection (a)(1) [This section] does not apply to a junior college district. SECTION 4. Section 161.001, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 161.001. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter applies only to: (1) a county that: (A) [(1)] has a population of 800,000 or more; (B) [(2)] is located on the international border; and (C) [(3)] before September 1, 2009, had a county ethics board appointed by the commissioners court; (2) a county that: (A) has a population of 425,000 or more; (B) is adjacent to a county with a population of 3.3 million or more; and (C) contains a portion of the San Jacinto River; and (3) a county that has a population of less than 40,000 that is adjacent to a county with a population of more than 3.3 million. SECTION 5. Subchapter C, Chapter 161, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 161.107 to read as follows: Sec. 161.107. DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN CONTRACTS. (a) The commission shall prominently display on the county's Internet website the following regarding contracts for services executed by the county that would require a person to register as a lobbyist under Chapter 305, Government Code: (1) the execution dates; (2) the contract duration terms, including any extension options; (3) the effective dates; (4) the final amount of money the county paid in the previous fiscal year; (5) the identity of all parties to the contract; (6) the identity of all subcontractors in the contract; and (7) the legislative agenda of the county. (b) In lieu of displaying the items described by Subsections (a)(1)-(6) regarding a contract for services that would require a person to register as a lobbyist under Chapter 305, Government Code, the commission may post on the county's Internet website the contract executed by the county for those services. (c) Information required to be displayed on a county's Internet website under this section is public information subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. SECTION 6. Chapter 170, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 170.002 to read as follows: Sec. 170.002. CODE OF ETHICS FOR CERTAIN COMMISSIONERS COURTS. (a) This section applies to a county that has a population of less than 40,000 that is adjacent to a county with a population of more than 3.3 million. (b) The commissioners court of a county subject to this section may adopt by order a code of ethics that provides standards of conduct for members of the commissioners court. (c) If a commissioners court of a county subject to this section adopts a code of ethics under this section, the code of ethics must require each member of the commissioners court to file a conflicts disclosure statement that is in addition to the statement required by Section 176.003. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1495 was passed by the House on May 8, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 28, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 1495 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 1495 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 116, Nays 11, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1495 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 1495 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor