Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | H.B. No. 1516 | |
1 | + | By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles, Creighton) H.B. No. 1516 | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019; | |
3 | + | April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher | |
4 | + | Education; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: | |
5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.) | |
6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
2 | 7 | ||
3 | 8 | ||
9 | + | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
4 | 10 | AN ACT | |
5 | 11 | relating to the intercollegiate athletics fee at Texas Southern | |
6 | 12 | University; authorizing the continued imposition of a fee. | |
7 | 13 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
8 | 14 | SECTION 1. Sections 54.5223(g) and (h), Education Code, are | |
9 | 15 | repealed. | |
10 | 16 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
11 | 17 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
12 | 18 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
13 | 19 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
14 | 20 | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. | |
15 | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ | |
16 | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House | |
17 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1516 was passed by the House on | |
18 | - | April 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 19, 2 | |
19 | - | present, not voting. | |
20 | - | ______________________________ | |
21 | - | Chief Clerk of the House | |
22 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1516 was passed by the Senate on | |
23 | - | May | |
24 | - | 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. | |
25 | - | ______________________________ | |
26 | - | Secretary of the Senate | |
27 | - | APPROVED: _____________________ | |
28 | - | Date | |
29 | - | _____________________ | |
30 | - | Governor | |
21 | + | * * * * * |