Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 29, 2019