Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1525 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1525
1+By: Burrows (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1525
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Finance; April 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 14, Nays 0;
6+ April 25, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1525 By: Nelson
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the administration and collection of sales and use
614 taxes applicable to sales involving marketplace providers.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 151.008(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
917 as follows:
1018 (b) "Seller" and "retailer" include:
1119 (1) a person in the business of making sales at auction
1220 of tangible personal property owned by the person or by another;
1321 (2) a person who makes more than two sales of taxable
1422 items during a 12-month period, including sales made in the
1523 capacity of an assignee for the benefit of creditors or receiver or
1624 trustee in bankruptcy;
1725 (3) a person regarded by the comptroller as a seller or
1826 retailer under Section 151.024;
1927 (4) a hotel, motel, or owner or lessor of an office or
2028 residential building or development that contracts and pays for
2129 telecommunications services for resale to guests or tenants;
2230 (5) a person who engages in regular or systematic
2331 solicitation of sales of taxable items in this state by the
2432 distribution of catalogs, periodicals, advertising flyers, or
2533 other advertising, by means of print, radio, or television media,
2634 or by mail, telegraphy, telephone, computer data base, cable,
2735 optic, microwave, or other communication system for the purpose of
2836 effecting sales of taxable items; [and]
2937 (6) a person who, under an agreement with another
3038 person, is:
3139 (A) entrusted with possession of tangible
3240 personal property with respect to which the other person has title
3341 or another ownership interest; and
3442 (B) authorized to sell, lease, or rent the
3543 property without additional action by the person having title to or
3644 another ownership interest in the property; and
3745 (7) a person who is a marketplace provider under
3846 Section 151.0242.
3947 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
4048 by adding Section 151.0242 to read as follows:
4149 Sec. 151.0242. MARKETPLACE PROVIDERS AND MARKETPLACE
4250 SELLERS. (a) In this section:
4351 (1) "Marketplace" means a physical or electronic
4452 medium through which persons other than the owner or operator of the
4553 medium make sales of taxable items. The term includes a store,
4654 Internet website, software application, or catalog.
4755 (2) "Marketplace provider" means a person who owns or
4856 operates a marketplace and directly or indirectly processes sales
4957 or payments for marketplace sellers.
5058 (3) "Marketplace seller" means a seller, other than
5159 the marketplace provider, who makes a sale of a taxable item through
5260 a marketplace.
5361 (b) Except as otherwise provided by this section, a
5462 marketplace provider has the rights and duties of a seller or
5563 retailer under this chapter with respect to sales made through the
5664 marketplace.
5765 (c) A marketplace provider shall:
5866 (1) certify to each marketplace seller that the
5967 marketplace provider assumes the rights and duties of a seller or
6068 retailer under this chapter with respect to sales made by the
6169 marketplace seller through the marketplace;
6270 (2) collect in the manner provided by Subchapters C
6371 and D the taxes imposed by this chapter on sales of taxable items
6472 made through the marketplace; and
6573 (3) report and remit under Subchapter I the taxes
6674 imposed by this chapter on all sales made through the marketplace.
6775 (d) A marketplace seller who in good faith accepts a
6876 marketplace provider's certification under Subsection (c)(1) shall
6977 exclude sales made through the marketplace from the marketplace
7078 seller's report under Subchapter I, notwithstanding Section
7179 151.406.
7280 (e) A marketplace seller shall retain records for all
7381 marketplace sales as required by Section 151.025.
7482 (f) A marketplace seller shall furnish to the marketplace
7583 provider information that is required to correctly collect and
7684 remit taxes imposed by this chapter. The information may include a
7785 certification of taxability that an item being sold is a taxable
7886 item, is not a taxable item, or is exempt from taxation.
7987 (g) Except as provided by Subsection (h), a marketplace
8088 provider is not liable for failure to collect and remit the correct
8189 amount of taxes imposed by this chapter if the marketplace provider
8290 demonstrates that the failure resulted from the marketplace
8391 provider's good faith reliance on incorrect or insufficient
8492 information provided by the marketplace seller. The marketplace
8593 seller is liable for a deficiency resulting from incorrect or
8694 insufficient information provided by the marketplace seller.
8795 (h) A marketplace provider and marketplace seller that are
8896 affiliates or associates, as defined by Section 1.002, Business
8997 Organizations Code, are jointly and severally liable for a
9098 deficiency resulting from a sale made by the marketplace seller
9199 through the marketplace.
92100 (i) This section does not affect the tax liability of a
93101 purchaser under Section 151.052 or 151.102.
94102 (j) A court may not certify an action brought against a
95103 marketplace provider concerning this section as a class action.
96104 (k) The comptroller may adopt rules and forms to implement
97105 this section and by rule except certain marketplace providers from
98106 some or all of the requirements of this section.
99107 SECTION 3. Section 321.203, Tax Code, is amended by adding
100108 Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
101109 (e-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
102110 a sale of a taxable item made by a marketplace seller through a
103111 marketplace as provided by Section 151.0242 is consummated at the
104112 location in this state to which the item is shipped or delivered or
105113 at which possession is taken by the purchaser.
106114 SECTION 4. Section 323.203, Tax Code, is amended by adding
107115 Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
108116 (e-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
109117 a sale of a taxable item made by a marketplace seller through a
110118 marketplace as provided by Section 151.0242 is consummated at the
111119 location in this state to which the item is shipped or delivered or
112120 at which possession is taken by the purchaser.
113121 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act do not affect
114122 tax liability accruing before the effective date of this Act. That
115123 liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted,
116124 and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of
117125 taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability
118126 for those taxes.
119127 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect October 1, 2019.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 1525 was passed by the House on April
123- 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 2 present, not
124- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
125- No. 1525 on May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 103, Nays 3,
126- 1 present, not voting.
127- ______________________________
128- Chief Clerk of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 1525 was passed by the Senate, with
130- amendments, on May 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
131- ______________________________
132- Secretary of the Senate
133- APPROVED: __________________
134- Date
135- __________________
136- Governor
128+ * * * * *