Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 16, 2019