Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019