|
06/15/2019
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
|
06/15/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Record vote RV#1922
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Schwertner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#753
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#679
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#678
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment tabled 11-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 10-Romero
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#677
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment tabled 9-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 8-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#676
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Motion to table fails 8-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 8-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 7-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#675
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 6-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#674
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Motion to table fails 6-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 6-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#673
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 5-Geren
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#672
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Motion to table fails 5-Geren
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 5-Geren
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#671
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment tabled 4-Stickland
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 3-Springer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 2-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Amended 1-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|