Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019