Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1553 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/08/2019

                    86R8124 JG-D
 By: White H.B. No. 1553


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Commission on Jail Standards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 511.004(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission consists of 11 [nine] members appointed
 by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate as
 follows:
 (1)  one [. One] member who is [must be] a sheriff of a
 county with a population of more than 35,000;
 (2)  [,] one member who is [must be] a sheriff of a
 county with a population of 35,000 or less;
 (3)  [,] one member who is [must be] a county judge;
 (4)  [,] one member who is [must be] a county
 commissioner;
 (5)  two members who are practitioners [, one must be a
 practitioner] of medicine licensed by the Texas State Board of
 Medical Examiners, one of whom must be board certified in
 psychiatry by the American Board of Psychiatry and Neurology or the
 American Osteopathic Board of Neurology and Psychiatry;
 (6)  one member who has expertise in providing veterans
 with information on the programs, services, and other resources
 that are available to veterans in this state; and
 (7)  [the other] four members who are [must be]
 representatives of the general public, at [. At] least one of whom
 must reside in [the four citizen members must be from] a county with
 a population of 35,000 or less.
 (c)  Members serve for terms of six years with the terms of
 either three or four [one-third of the] members expiring on January
 31 of each odd-numbered year.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 31, 2019, the
 governor shall appoint the two additional members required under
 Section 511.004(a), Government Code, as amended by this Act. In
 appointing those members, the governor shall appoint one person to
 a term expiring January 31, 2023, and one person to a term expiring
 January 31, 2025.
 (b)  Until all appointees to the Commission on Jail Standards
 have taken office, a quorum of the commission is a majority of the
 number of members who are qualified.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.