Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1584 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1584
1+By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1584
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2019;
4+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
5+ Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to health benefit plan coverage of prescription drugs for
613 stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Chapter 1369, Insurance Code, is amended by
916 adding Subchapter E-1 to read as follows:
1017 SUBCHAPTER E-1. COVERAGE OF PRESCRIPTION DRUGS FOR STAGE-FOUR
1118 ADVANCED, METASTATIC CANCER
1219 Sec. 1369.211. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
1320 (1) "Associated conditions" means the symptoms or side
1421 effects associated with stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer or
1522 its treatment and which, in the judgment of the health care
1623 practitioner, further jeopardize the health of a patient if left
1724 untreated.
1825 (2) "Stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer" means
1926 cancer that has spread from the primary or original site of the
2027 cancer to nearby tissues, lymph nodes, or other areas or parts of
2128 the body.
2229 Sec. 1369.212. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
2330 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
2431 benefits for medical or surgical expenses or pharmacy benefits
2532 incurred as a result of a health condition, accident, or sickness,
2633 including an individual, group, blanket, or franchise insurance
2734 policy or insurance agreement, a group hospital service contract,
2835 or an individual or group evidence of coverage or similar coverage
2936 document that is issued by:
3037 (1) an insurance company;
3138 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
3239 under Chapter 842;
3340 (3) a health maintenance organization operating under
3441 Chapter 843;
3542 (4) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
3643 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844;
3744 (5) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
3845 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846;
3946 (6) a stipulated premium company operating under
4047 Chapter 884;
4148 (7) a fraternal benefit society operating under
4249 Chapter 885;
4350 (8) a Lloyd's plan operating under Chapter 941; or
4451 (9) an exchange operating under Chapter 942.
4552 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this subchapter applies
4653 to:
4754 (1) a small employer health benefit plan subject to
4855 Chapter 1501, including coverage provided through a health group
4956 cooperative under Subchapter B of that chapter;
5057 (2) a standard health benefit plan issued under
5158 Chapter 1507;
5259 (3) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
5360 (4) a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
5461 (5) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
5562 (6) a plan providing basic coverage under Chapter
5663 1601;
5764 (7) health benefits provided by or through a church
5865 benefits board under Subchapter I, Chapter 22, Business
5966 Organizations Code;
6067 (8) group health coverage made available by a school
6168 district in accordance with Section 22.004, Education Code;
6269 (9) the state Medicaid program, including the Medicaid
6370 managed care program operated under Chapter 533, Government Code;
6471 (10) the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
6572 Health and Safety Code;
6673 (11) a regional or local health care program operated
6774 under Section 75.104, Health and Safety Code; and
6875 (12) a self-funded health benefit plan sponsored by a
6976 professional employer organization under Chapter 91, Labor Code.
7077 (c) This subchapter applies to coverage under a group health
7178 benefit plan provided to a resident of this state regardless of
7279 whether the group policy, agreement, or contract is delivered,
7380 issued for delivery, or renewed in this state.
7481 Sec. 1369.213. PROHIBITED CONDUCT. (a) A health benefit
7582 plan that provides coverage for stage-four advanced, metastatic
7683 cancer and associated conditions may not require, before the health
7784 benefit plan provides coverage of a prescription drug approved by
7885 the United States Food and Drug Administration, that the enrollee:
7986 (1) fail to successfully respond to a different drug;
8087 or
8188 (2) prove a history of failure of a different drug.
8289 (b) This section applies only to a drug the use of which is:
8390 (1) consistent with best practices for the treatment
8491 of stage-four advanced, metastatic cancer or an associated
85- condition;
86- (2) supported by peer-reviewed, evidence-based
87- literature; and
88- (3) approved by the United States Food and Drug
89- Administration.
92+ condition; and
93+ (2) supported by peer-reviewed medical literature.
9094 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a health benefit plan
9195 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
9296 2020. A health benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or
9397 renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it existed
9498 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
9599 continued in effect for that purpose.
96100 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
97- ______________________________ ______________________________
98- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
99- I certify that H.B. No. 1584 was passed by the House on May 7,
100- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 19, 1 present, not
101- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
102- No. 1584 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 115, Nays 24,
103- 2 present, not voting.
104- ______________________________
105- Chief Clerk of the House
106- I certify that H.B. No. 1584 was passed by the Senate, with
107- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
108- 1.
109- ______________________________
110- Secretary of the Senate
111- APPROVED: __________________
112- Date
113- __________________
114- Governor
101+ * * * * *