1 | | - | H.B. No. 16 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Leach, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst, Hall) H.B. No. 16 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 25, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 3; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 16 By: Buckingham |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the enforcement of the rights of a living unborn child |
---|
6 | 14 | | after an abortion; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal |
---|
7 | 15 | | offense. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 151.002, Family Code, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 151.002. RIGHTS OF A LIVING CHILD AFTER AN ABORTION OR |
---|
12 | 20 | | PREMATURE BIRTH; CIVIL PENALTY; CRIMINAL OFFENSE. |
---|
13 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Section 151.002, Family Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 22 | | adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (c) For purposes of this section, a physician-patient |
---|
16 | 24 | | relationship is established between a child born alive after an |
---|
17 | 25 | | abortion and the physician who performed or attempted to perform |
---|
18 | 26 | | the abortion. The physician must exercise the same degree of |
---|
19 | 27 | | professional skill, care, and diligence to preserve the life and |
---|
20 | 28 | | health of the child as a reasonably diligent and conscientious |
---|
21 | 29 | | physician would render to any other child born alive at the same |
---|
22 | 30 | | gestational age. In this subsection, "professional skill, care, and |
---|
23 | 31 | | diligence" includes a requirement that the physician who performed |
---|
24 | 32 | | or attempted the abortion ensure that the child born alive be |
---|
27 | 34 | | (d) A woman on whom an abortion, as defined by Section |
---|
28 | 35 | | 245.002, Health and Safety Code, is performed or attempted to be |
---|
29 | 36 | | performed may not be held liable under this section. |
---|
30 | 37 | | (e) A physician who violates Subsection (c) by failing to |
---|
31 | 38 | | provide the appropriate medical treatment to a child born alive |
---|
32 | 39 | | after an abortion or an attempted abortion is liable to the state |
---|
33 | 40 | | for a civil penalty of not less than $100,000. The attorney general |
---|
34 | 41 | | may bring a suit to collect the penalty. In addition to the civil |
---|
35 | 42 | | penalty, the attorney general may recover reasonable attorney's |
---|
36 | 43 | | fees. The civil penalty described in this subsection is in addition |
---|
37 | 44 | | to any other recovery authorized under other law. |
---|
38 | 45 | | (f) A person who has knowledge of a failure to comply with |
---|
39 | 46 | | this section shall report to the attorney general. The identity and |
---|
40 | 47 | | any personally identifiable information of the person reporting the |
---|
41 | 48 | | failure to comply with this section is confidential under Chapter |
---|
42 | 49 | | 552, Government Code. |
---|
43 | 50 | | (g) A physician or health care practitioner who violates |
---|
44 | 51 | | Subsection (c) by failing to provide the appropriate medical |
---|
45 | 52 | | treatment to a child born alive after an abortion or an attempted |
---|
46 | 53 | | abortion commits an offense. An offense under this subsection is a |
---|
47 | 54 | | felony of the third degree. |
---|
48 | 55 | | SECTION 3. Section 151.002, Family Code, as amended by this |
---|
49 | 56 | | Act, applies only to a child born alive on or after the effective |
---|
50 | 57 | | date of this Act. |
---|
51 | 58 | | SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
52 | 59 | | to the prosecution of an offense committed on or after the effective |
---|
53 | 60 | | date of this Act. The prosecution of an offense committed before |
---|
54 | 61 | | the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on |
---|
55 | 62 | | the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued |
---|
56 | 63 | | in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an |
---|
57 | 64 | | offense is committed before the effective date of this Act if any |
---|
58 | 65 | | element of the offense occurs before the effective date. |
---|
59 | 66 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 16 was passed by the House on April |
---|
63 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 94, Nays 2, 49 present, not |
---|
64 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
65 | | - | No. 16 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 84, Nays 57, 2 |
---|
66 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
69 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 16 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
70 | | - | amendments, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays |
---|
71 | | - | 10. |
---|
72 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
74 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Date |
---|
76 | | - | __________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 67 | + | * * * * * |
---|