1 | 1 | | 86R3761 JG-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Moody H.B. No. 1613 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the provision of recovery community organization |
---|
8 | 8 | | services under Medicaid. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 531.09991 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 531.09991. RECOVERY COMMUNITY ORGANIZATIONS. (a) In |
---|
13 | 13 | | this section, "recovery community organization" means a nonprofit |
---|
14 | 14 | | organization that mobilizes resources inside and outside of a local |
---|
15 | 15 | | community to increase the prevalence and quality of long-term |
---|
16 | 16 | | recovery for persons with substance use disorder and their family |
---|
17 | 17 | | members and that is wholly or partly governed by persons recovering |
---|
18 | 18 | | from a substance use disorder or their family members. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The executive commissioner, with input from the work |
---|
20 | 20 | | group established under Subsection (c), shall adopt rules to |
---|
21 | 21 | | provide Medicaid reimbursement for services provided by recovery |
---|
22 | 22 | | community organizations, which must include: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) rules that establish training requirements for |
---|
24 | 24 | | recovery community organization service providers; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) rules that establish certification and |
---|
26 | 26 | | supervision requirements for recovery community organizations; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) rules that define the scope of services that |
---|
28 | 28 | | recovery community organizations may provide; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (4) rules that distinguish services provided by |
---|
30 | 30 | | recovery community organizations from other services that a person |
---|
31 | 31 | | must hold a license to provide; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (5) any other rules necessary to protect the health |
---|
33 | 33 | | and safety of persons receiving services provided by recovery |
---|
34 | 34 | | community organizations. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) The executive commissioner shall establish a work group |
---|
36 | 36 | | to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (b). |
---|
37 | 37 | | The work group is composed of at least nine and not more than 13 |
---|
38 | 38 | | members with expertise in substance use recovery or recovery |
---|
39 | 39 | | community organizations. The executive commissioner shall ensure |
---|
40 | 40 | | that at least half of the members in the work group are from rural |
---|
41 | 41 | | communities in this state. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (d) The executive commissioner shall appoint one member of |
---|
43 | 43 | | the work group to serve as presiding officer. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (e) The work group is automatically abolished on the |
---|
45 | 45 | | adoption of rules under Subsection (b). |
---|
46 | 46 | | (f) Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and this subsection expire |
---|
47 | 47 | | September 1, 2021. |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2021, Section 32.024, Human |
---|
49 | 49 | | Resources Code, is amended by adding Subsection (pp) to read as |
---|
50 | 50 | | follows: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (pp) The commission in its rules and standards governing the |
---|
52 | 52 | | scope of services provided under the medical assistance program |
---|
53 | 53 | | shall include services provided by recovery community |
---|
54 | 54 | | organizations as defined by Section 531.09991, Government Code, to |
---|
55 | 55 | | the extent permitted by federal law. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 3. Not later than December 31, 2019, the executive |
---|
57 | 57 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
58 | 58 | | establish the work group required by Section 531.09991, Government |
---|
59 | 59 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2020, the executive |
---|
61 | 61 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
62 | 62 | | adopt the rules required by Section 531.09991, Government Code, as |
---|
63 | 63 | | added by this Act. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
65 | 65 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
66 | 66 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
67 | 67 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
68 | 68 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
69 | 69 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 6. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
71 | 71 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|