1 | | - | H.B. No. 1627 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1627 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 3, 2019, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, |
---|
| 6 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the removal of certain counties from the Texas |
---|
6 | 13 | | emissions reduction plan. |
---|
7 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 386.001(2), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 16 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 17 | | (2) "Affected county" includes: |
---|
11 | 18 | | (A) Bastrop County; |
---|
12 | 19 | | (B) Bexar County; |
---|
13 | 20 | | (C) Caldwell County; |
---|
14 | 21 | | (D) Comal County; |
---|
15 | 22 | | (E) Ellis County; |
---|
16 | 23 | | (F) Gregg County; |
---|
17 | 24 | | (G) Guadalupe County; |
---|
18 | 25 | | (H) Harrison County; |
---|
19 | 26 | | (I) Hays County; |
---|
20 | 27 | | (J) Henderson County; |
---|
21 | 28 | | (K) Hood County; |
---|
22 | 29 | | (L) Hunt County; |
---|
23 | 30 | | (M) Johnson County; |
---|
24 | 31 | | (N) Kaufman County; |
---|
25 | 32 | | (O) Nueces County; |
---|
26 | 33 | | (P) Parker County; |
---|
27 | 34 | | (Q) Rockwall County; |
---|
28 | 35 | | (R) Rusk County; |
---|
29 | 36 | | (S) San Patricio County; |
---|
30 | 37 | | (T) Smith County; |
---|
31 | 38 | | (U) Travis County; |
---|
32 | 39 | | (V) Upshur County; |
---|
33 | 40 | | (W) [Victoria County; |
---|
34 | 41 | | [(X)] Williamson County; |
---|
35 | 42 | | (X) [(Y)] Wilson County; and |
---|
36 | 43 | | (Y) [(Z)] any other county designated as an |
---|
37 | 44 | | affected county by commission rule because of deteriorating air |
---|
38 | 45 | | quality. |
---|
39 | 46 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
40 | 47 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
41 | 48 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
42 | 49 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
43 | 50 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1627 was passed by the House on |
---|
47 | | - | April 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, |
---|
48 | | - | 2 |
---|
49 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
52 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1627 was passed by the Senate on |
---|
53 | | - | May 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Date |
---|
58 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 51 | + | * * * * * |
---|