Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1642 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/12/2019

                    86R6556 SOS-D
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1642


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for issuing and renewing certain
 certificates and licenses to practice barbering.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1601.265(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Section 1603.2545, the [The] department
 shall issue a license or certificate to an applicant for a license
 or certificate issued under Section 1601.253, 1601.256, or 1601.258
 if the applicant:
 (1)  submits an application on a form prescribed by the
 department;
 (2)  pays the application fee; and
 (3)  provides proof that the applicant holds a current
 license to engage in the same or a similar activity issued by
 another jurisdiction that has license requirements substantially
 equivalent to those of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1601.402, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a Class A barber or
 barber technician may not renew a certificate or license issued
 under Section 1601.253 or 1601.256 unless the person has passed an
 examination administered under Section 1603.2545. This subsection
 expires June 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1603, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1603.2545 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1603.2545.  EXAMINATION FOR CERTAIN CLASS A BARBER
 CERTIFICATE OR BARBER TECHNICIAN LICENSE APPLICANTS.  An applicant
 under Section 1601.265 for a Class A barber certificate or barber
 technician license must pass an examination prescribed by the
 department.  The content of the examination must focus on customer
 safety, including sanitary and hygiene requirements.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement the changes in law made by this Act.
 (b)  The changes in law made by this Act with respect to the
 issuance of a certificate or license apply only to an application
 for the issuance of a Class A barber certificate or barber
 technician license submitted on or after January 1, 2020. An
 application for the issuance of a Class A barber certificate or
 barber technician license submitted before that date is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (c)  Section 1601.402(d), Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a Class A barber certificate or barber
 technician license that expires on or after January 1, 2020.  A
 certificate or license that expires before that date is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the certificate or license expired,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.