Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1682 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/29/2019

                            86R24068 SCL-F
 By: Raney, Hinojosa, Clardy, Meza, Meyer, H.B. No. 1682
 et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1682:
 By:  Rose C.S.H.B. No. 1682


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed
 day-care centers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.0412 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0412.  COLLECTION OF LICENSED DAY-CARE CENTER DATA.
 (a)  In this section, "group of children" and "specified age" are
 determined by the formula provided in the commission's minimum
 standards for child-care centers.
 (b)  The commission, in collaboration with the department
 and using existing resources, shall collect, compile, and publish
 on the commission's Internet website the following data aggregated
 by child age on reported incidents in licensed day-care centers
 that threaten or impair the basic health, safety, or welfare of a
 child:
 (1)  the number of incidents investigated by the
 commission or department and assigned the commission's highest
 priority;
 (2)  the number of incidents investigated by the
 commission or department and assigned the commission's
 second-highest priority;
 (3)  the number of violations;
 (4)  the number of confirmed serious injuries to
 children; and
 (5)  the number of child fatalities.
 (c)  During each monitoring inspection of a licensed
 day-care center the commission conducts, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall collect the following data for each group
 of children four years of age and younger in the day-care center:
 (1)  the specified age of the children in the group;
 (2)  the number of children in the group; and
 (3)  the number of caregivers supervising the children
 in the group.
 (d)  The commission shall make the data collected under this
 section available to persons researching the factors related to
 child injury, maltreatment, and death in licensed day-care centers
 on request.
 (e)  The commission, using existing resources, shall provide
 an annual report to the legislature that includes:
 (1)  the number of confirmed serious injuries and
 fatalities for children four years of age and younger that occurred
 at each licensed day-care center, including information collected
 by the department, aggregated by the age of the injured or deceased
 child;
 (2)  the priority assigned to the investigation
 conducted by the commission or department in response to an
 incident that resulted in a serious injury or child fatality;
 (3)  the number of investigations conducted by the
 commission or department at each licensed day-care center involving
 a child four years of age or younger that were assigned the highest
 priority or second-highest priority, aggregated by the age of the
 youngest affected child; and
 (4)  the number of violations the commission found at
 each licensed day-care center during investigations described by
 Subdivision (3).
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.042, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (m-1) to read as follows:
 (m-1)  Not later than January 1, 2021, the executive
 commissioner shall review the data collected under Section 42.0412
 and prepare and submit to the legislature a report that includes
 recommendations regarding modifications to the minimum standards
 by age group to enhance child safety. This subsection expires
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 42.0412(d), Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
 Commission is not required to comply with that subsection until
 January 31, 2020.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.